This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 02:38:20 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: LEE, UNA ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 THE ESTATE OF LEE, UNA ANDERSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOLES, W JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1232

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOLES, W JOEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

KIRKLAND, JERRY T CPA

Claimants

ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS

SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM INC

Decedent

LEE, UNA ANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

DEMARIA, KATHLEEN K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM INC FOR $214.34 - EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM EMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM - ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS FOR $18.82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC ON AGENCY FOR HLTHCARE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketHARLEY57FRED@GMAIL.COM, JFRANCIS63@COX.NET, ALABAMAGURL1965@YAHOO.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDECLINATION OF RIGHTS TO SERVE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE / EXECUTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EAMIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS (SATISFIED - is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMARIA, KATHLEEN K