This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/11/2022 at 19:31:54 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: KNIGHT, MABLE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 THE ESTATE OF KNIGHT, MABLE JOHNSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL and BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1490

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Claimants

HCA FLORIDA WEST HOSPITAL

HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA

Applicant

JOHNSON, RAYMOND

Decedent

KNIGHT, MABLE JOHNSON

Interested Party

JOHNSON, JUANITA F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

FISHER, BENTLEY M

Interested Party Attorney

STAPLES, THOMAS C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingDate time: 1/4/2023 10:00 AM; Event: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: BOLES, W.. JOEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/04/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN / , JDG: BOLES, W.. JOEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM @10:00 AM ON 1/4/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA FOR $253.00 EMAILED ATTY THOMAS C STAPLES ON 11/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - HCA FLORIDA WEST HOSPITAL FOR $1,725.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION TO WAIVE BOND - THOMAS STAPLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR ADMIN - THOMAS STAPLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/12/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001490

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less