This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/01/2023 at 18:14:13 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: KEYES, ROBERT EBERT

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 THE ESTATE OF KEYES, ROBERT EBERT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0309

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

KEYES, ROBERT EBERT

Not Yet Classified

KEYES, ROBERT EBERT JR

KEYES, ALLEN PEERLESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HOSKIN, CHARLES P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 4/5/2023; Receipt Number: 2023026204; Applied Amount: $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2023026204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED - COPY MADE AND SLOTTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEPT OF HLTH TO CORRECT DC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8940.1637 / 2023017978)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8940.1635 / 2023017976)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/7/2023; Receipt Number: 2023017045; Applied Amount: $18.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/2/2023; Receipt Number: 2023015371; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDEATHCERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023015371

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/02/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CP 000309

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR AUTHORIZING CORRECTION OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less