This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/17/2023 at 18:05:52 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: IKERT, BONNIE RAE

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 THE ESTATE OF IKERT, BONNIE RAE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1997

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

IKERT, BONNIE RAE

Not Yet Classified

HUNTINGHOUSE, LESLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WHIBBS, SUZANNE N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO FL AHCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8914.70 / 2023001574)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8914.68 / 2023001572)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketWAIVER JOINDER AND CONSENT TO PDH- GLENNA CALAME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NTE AND BOND AND CONSENT TO APPT OF PR- GLENNA CALAME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001997

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less