This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/15/2023 at 19:08:16 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: HAUENSTEIN LOPEZ, JULIE KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 THE ESTATE OF HAUENSTEIN LOPEZ, JULIE KATHLEEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1858

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

LOPEZ, LEROY B

Claimants

USAA SAVINGS BANK

TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS INC

Decedent

HAUENSTEIN LOPEZ, JULIE KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

HOSKIN, CHARLES P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE INITIAL ESTATE INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS INC FOR $2,874.91

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - USAA SAVINGS BANK FOR $16,158.48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 12/15/2022; Receipt Number: 2022092382; Applied Amount: $12.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $12.00 RECEIPT #2022092382

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE SLOTTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEPT OF HLTH TO CORRECT CERTIFICATION OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8894.1350 / 2022113795)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDEATHCERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/17/2022; Receipt Number: 2022086026; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022086026

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NTE AND BOND AND CONSENT TO APPT OF PR - REYNA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NTE AND BOND AND CONSENT TO APPT OF PR - EVAN LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NTE AND BOND AND CONSENT TO APPT OF PR - AARON LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less