This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/20/2022 at 19:39:33 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: HADDEN, JASON MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 THE ESTATE OF HADDEN, JASON MICHAEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1378

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

HADDEN, JOANNA L

Claimants

DISCOVER BANK

ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA

Decedent

HADDEN, JASON MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

STAPLES, THOMAS C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA FOR $630.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - BANK OF AMERICA N.A. FOR $2,141.56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FOR $35,538.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS FOR $1,060.83

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - DISCOVER BANK FOR $4,256.27 EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFLORIDA NON TAX CERTIFICATE/AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022063272

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF FN ON PA - ETHAN HADDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF FN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: STAPLES, THOMAS C ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less