This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 13:36:48 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: GREEN, DENNIS DAVID SR

Case Summary

On 03/24/2015 THE ESTATE OF GREEN, DENNIS DAVID SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0383

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

GREEN, JULIANA G

Decedent

GREEN, DENNIS DAVID SR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.7706.663 / 2017032841)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketWAIVER FOR ACCOUNTING/DISCHARGE, SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE @ JULIANA G. GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO CLOSE UNTIL 5/7/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTY PREDDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND FOR FILING PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/25/2016; Receipt Number: 2016019811; Applied Amount: $18.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketPAYMENT $18.00 RECEIPT #2016019811- FOR EXEMP PACKAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/24/2015; Receipt Number: 2015028855; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2015028855

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketFORMAL ADMINISTRATION ASSESSED $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketJUDGE KINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/24/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CP 000383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less