This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 18:34:45 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: GARZA, CAROLYN LEA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 THE ESTATE OF GARZA, CAROLYN LEA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1894

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

MESSICK, RUSSELL G

Decedent

GARZA, CAROLYN LEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

MCDONALD, BRUCE ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8904.9 / 2022119102)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8904.24 / 2022119105)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/28/2022; Receipt Number: 2022087850; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022087850

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less