This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/12/2023 at 19:07:03 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: FILLINGIM, ERIC THOMAS

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 THE ESTATE OF FILLINGIM, ERIC THOMAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0979

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Claimants

PARGON EMERGENCY SERVICE LLC, C/O DCM SERVICES (SATISFIED -

HOME SHOPPING NEWTWORK- HSN (SATISFIED -

RADIOLOGY ASSOC OF PENSACOLA (SATISFIED -

PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC (SATISFIED -

WEST FLORIDA MEDICAL CENTER CLINIC P A (SATISFIED -

GULF POWER COMPANY (SATISFIED -

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

FILLINGIM, JONATHAN

Decedent

FILLINGIM, ERIC THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

LOCKLIN, OSCAR J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.8691.1703 / 2021140630)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR CLOSING FORMAL ADMIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCT, PORTIONS OF PET FOR DISCHG & SVC OF PET FOR DISCHG; RECEIPT OF BENEF & CONSENT TO DISCHG - JONATHAN ERIC FILLINGIM & CHRISTY MOTLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING PR TO ABANDON ESTATE PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADDITIONAL FILING OF EXHIBIT "B" TO PET FOR ORDER AUTH PERS REPR TO ABANDON REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - CHRISTY MOTLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPT OF PR AND WAIVER OF NTE OF BOND - CHRISTY MOTLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketKINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/31/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CP 000979

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less