This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 18:36:01 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: CLARKE, GREGORY V

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 THE ESTATE OF CLARKE, GREGORY V was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1891

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

 

Party Details

Claimant

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Applicant

CLARKE, CATHERINE

Decedent

CLARKE, GREGORY V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

SLIVA, AMY LOGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC FOR $6,812.80

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE ON PSA AND PDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8905.1047 / 2022119983)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/28/2022; Receipt Number: 2022087775; Applied Amount: $235.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2022087775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001891

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less