This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/14/2021 at 19:00:51 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: BAKER, PAMILLA STREET

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 THE ESTATE OF BAKER, PAMILLA STREET was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1362

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Claimants

WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP D/B/A SOUTHEAS TOYOTA FINANCE

WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Applicants

WATERS, CINDY

BARNES, MICHAEL R

Decedent

BAKER, PAMILLA STREET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MATTHEWS, EDSEL F JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingDate time: 12/30/2020 12:30 PM; Event: HEARING; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 12/30/2020 AT 12:30 PM IN / , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIDEO CONFERENCING N 12/30/2020@12:30 P.M CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP D/B/A SOUTHEAS TOYOTA FINANCE FOR $3,050.43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER FOR $1,148.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - OMNI FINANCIAL CRP D/B/A SOUTHEAST TOYOTA FINANCE C/O DCM SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/19/2020; Receipt Number: 2020069906; Applied Amount: $235.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2020069906

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: MATTHEWS, EDSEL F JR ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (SATISFIED - is a litigant

Latest cases where World Omni Financial Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEWS, EDSEL F JR