Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/13/2021 at 15:33:10 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. THE ESTATE OF DONNA CLARK

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE ESTATE OF DONNA CLARK. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0925

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

LAKE ESTELLE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BEN G CLARK

TENANT II UNKNOWN TENANT

DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA CLARK

TENANT III UNKNOWN TENANT

CLARK, BEN G

TENANT I UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT IV UNKNOWN TENANT

THE ESTATE OF DONNA CLARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASSEL, GARY I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketLISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8513.894 / 2021043542)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 4/21/2021; Receipt Number: 2021029824; Applied Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION REGARDING POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION AS TO CARES ACT AND EXECUTIVE ORDER 20-180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLISPENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gassel, Gary I