This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/17/2022 at 19:31:58 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. MILLER, JAYNA L

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MILLER, JAYNA L. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] WILLIAMS, THOMAS H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0949

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] WILLIAMS, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

MILLER, JAYNA L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAYNA L MILLER

AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KISER, AMY M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

5/19/2022: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF LISPENDENS

5/19/2022: NOTICE OF LISPENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

6/1/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

6/1/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 5/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022038712; Applied Amount: $974.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8789.1018 / 2022052541)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR ESERVICE FOR THE CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LISPENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 000949

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less