This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/01/2021 at 19:19:30 (UTC).

TELTEVSKAYA, EKATERINA vs. Defendant Not Entered

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 TELTEVSKAYA, EKATERINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Defendant Not Entered. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2051

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TELTEVSKAYA, EKATERINA

KAKONE, VICTOR

Respondent

IN RE SIMPLIFIED DOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YORK, LISA K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - Recorded (OR.8596.300 / 2021089586)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL/FINAL HEARING 8/10/2021 AT 2:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE- WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/7/2021; Receipt Number: 2021043420; Applied Amount: $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2021043420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: YORK, LISA K ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 002051

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YORK, LISA K