This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 22:27:37 (UTC).

STOLSIG, KAYLEE M vs. STOLSIG, JORGEN C

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 STOLSIG, KAYLEE M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STOLSIG, JORGEN C. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3168

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STOLSIG, KAYLEE M

Respondent

STOLSIG, JORGEN C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RYBA, GAYLE J

Respondent Attorney

YORK, LISA K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketTHIRD SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER/WIFE'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 003168

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YORK, LISA K