This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/10/2021 at 18:02:06 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. POWELL, SHAMIM GAYLE

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against POWELL, SHAMIM GAYLE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3806

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

POWELL, SHAMIM GAYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

7/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingDate time: 9/17/2021 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (09/17/2021 PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/14/2021; Receipt Number: 2021054725; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021054725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: REISS, JENNIFER L ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L