Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 18:03:27 (UTC).

SMITH, AUSTIN vs. TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 SMITH, AUSTIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0326

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH, AUSTIN

SMITH, KAITLIN

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN, YITZHAK

Defendant Attorney

PALMER, ELIZABETH NICOLE

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2/11/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY'S PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/12/2021; Receipt Number: 2021010432; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021010432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketYLEVIN@LEVINLITIGATION.COM, SERVICE@LEVINLITIGATION.COM, NPALMER@WPSLAWYERS.COM, JBOLING@WPSLAWYERS.COM, CSCHREINER@WPSLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: LEVIN, YITZHAK ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/11/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000326

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill SIgnature Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YITZHAK LEVIN