This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/07/2021 at 15:18:34 (UTC).

SHIPWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION vs. 16788 PKD LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 SHIPWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 16788 PKD LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0695

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIPWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

16788 PKD LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAISER, JOHN A JR

Defendant Attorney

BEASLEY, ROBERT O

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/2/2020: COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM

8/21/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS IV AND V OF DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER WITH COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/27/2020; Receipt Number: 2020050920; Applied Amount: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2020050920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/4/2020; Receipt Number: 2020038880; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: FRAISER, JOHN A JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020038880

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketJFRAISER@MOORHEADLAW.COM ESERVICE@MOORHEADLAW.COM, ROBSERVICE@LAWPENSACOLA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/02/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 000695

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRAISER, JOHN A JR