This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 15:04:56 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs. BREWTON, DONNA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 SECOND ROUND SUB LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BREWTON, DONNA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0608

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

BREWTON, DONNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

2/1/2020: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

2/1/2020: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/11/2020 1:30 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/3/2020; Receipt Number: 2020009402; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED E-MAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 03/11/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020009402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 000608

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less