This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 04:59:50 (UTC).

RUSHTON, LAURA A vs. HARTWELL, JUSTIN J

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 RUSHTON, LAURA A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTWELL, JUSTIN J. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0838

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSHTON, LAURA A

Defendant

HARTWELL, JUSTIN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.7893.1115 / 2018033617)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF LAURA A RUSHTONS REPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF LAURA A RUSHTONS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF LAURA A RUSHTONS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017059715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCOURTDOCS@MICHLESBOOTH.COM, FILING@MICHLESBOOTH.COM, ESERVICEPNS@CONROYSIMBERG.COM, GCHIESA@CONROYSIMBERG.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENANT JUSTIN J. HARTWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JUSTIN J. HARTWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT JUSTIN J. HARTWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: ROGERS, JOHN E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/07/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000838

    Read MoreRead Less