This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 18:39:56 (UTC).

RITCHIE, JESSICA ANN vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 RITCHIE, JESSICA ANN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1863

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RITCHIE, JESSICA ANN

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, CHARLES PHILIP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S SURVEILLANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, JESSICA ANN RITCHIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S EMAIL DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketPHIL@ASKALAWYERFIRST.COM, WKENDALL@ASKALAWYERFIRST.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/30/2022; Receipt Number: 2022074121; Applied Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022074121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: HALL, CHARLES PHILIP ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001863

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL, CHARLES PHILIP