This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 06/08/2022 at 18:13:52 (UTC).

REYES, ERIKA E vs. COOLEY, STANLEY TRAVIS

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 REYES, ERIKA E filed an Other lawsuit against COOLEY, STANLEY TRAVIS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER, JOHN L and [ L ] MILLER, JOHN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1328

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER, JOHN L

[ L ] MILLER, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REYES, ERIKA E

Respondents

COOLEY, TRAVIS S

COOLEY, STANLEY TRAVIS

Not Yet Classified

LAW OFFICE OF JAMES BURNS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURNS, JAMES M

Respondent Attorney

BLACKLEDGE, AUTUMN BECK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 6/1/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TEMPORARY RELIEF 9/13/2022 AT 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION AS TO SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 5/2/2022; Receipt Number: 2022033159; Applied Amount: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2022033159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketJIMBURNSFLLAW@GMAIL.COM, PLEADINGS.JMBPA@GMAIL.COM, ESERVICE@AUTUMNOBECK.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMILLER, JOHN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER/FORMER WIFE'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND FOR OTHER RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/08/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 DR 001328

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACKLEDGE, AUTUMN BECK