This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 06:29:08 (UTC).

RAY, SAMUEL J vs. NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 RAY, SAMUEL J filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK, LACEY POWELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0871

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY, SAMUEL J

Defendants

1815 LOWELL PARTNERS, LLC (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

ENSLEY SQUARE LLC (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

RICHARD S. COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD S. COHEN TRUST

NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC

JENNY W. WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W. WILLIAMS TRUST

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.8074.609 / 2019030020)

4/5/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.8074.609 / 2019030020)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES

11/3/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES

DEFENDANT'S, NPC INTERNATIONAL INC DBA PIZZA HUT, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/26/2017: DEFENDANT'S, NPC INTERNATIONAL INC DBA PIZZA HUT, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS RICHARD S. COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD S. COHEN TRUST AND JENNY W. WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W. WILLIAMS TRUSTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/23/2017: DEFENDANTS RICHARD S. COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD S. COHEN TRUST AND JENNY W. WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W. WILLIAMS TRUSTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S, NPC INTERNATIONAL INC DBA PIZZA HUT, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT

7/31/2017: DEFENDANT'S, NPC INTERNATIONAL INC DBA PIZZA HUT, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JENNY W WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W WILLIAMS TRUST

7/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JENNY W WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W WILLIAMS TRUST

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT RICHARD S COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD S COHEN TRUST

7/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT RICHARD S COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE RICHARD S COHEN TRUST

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/27/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD S COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF RICHARD S COHEN TRUST AND JENNY W WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W WILLIAMS TRUST

7/27/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD S COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF RICHARD S COHEN TRUST AND JENNY W WILLIAMS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JENNY W WILLIAMS TRUST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BY RANDALL G ROGERS AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION

7/20/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BY RANDALL G ROGERS AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION

COMPLAINT

6/9/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.8074.609 / 2019030020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMEDIATION STATUS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT NPC INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC.S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketMTHOMAS@ESCLAW.COM, WTODD@ESCLAW.COM, JLW@ESCLAW.COM, MHENDRIX@FLORIDA-LAW.COM, LODOM@FLORIDA-LAW.COM, VTAYLOR@FLORIDA-LAW.COM, MHENDRIX@FLORIDA-LAW.COM, LODOM@FLORIDA-LAW.COM, VTAYLOR@FLORIDA-LAW.COM, BSHELL@ESCLAW.COM, WTODD@ESCLAW.COM, JLW@ESCLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: THOMAS, MICHAEL STEVEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketMILLER, JOHN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/09/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000871

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant