Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 18:47:58 (UTC).

RAWLS, DEBRA vs. CROSBY, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 RAWLS, DEBRA filed an Other lawsuit against CROSBY, SANDRA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBINSON, COLEMAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0258

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAWLS, DEBRA

Defendants

CROSBY, SANDRA

GSI BROKERAGE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFMAN, MATTHEW C

JURGENSEN, NATHAN ROBERT

HOFFMAN, BRIAN W

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/5/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/5/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

2/4/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/4/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/4/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS TO NONPARTY SUBPOENAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM FROM EDITH J. CROSBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM JAMES SHELBY CROSBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM MONNA CROSBY SILVANIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM SCRAP, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM WESTON R. RAWLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM ZAKARY WINANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM AMY RAWLS WINANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NONPARTY PRODUCTION FROM EDITH J. CROSBY TRUSTEE OF THE ELMER ANDEDITH CROSBY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 24,2001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/25/2021; Receipt Number: 2021021996; Applied Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021008926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketTED@BOROSKI-TRAYLOR, STEVE@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM, MARYANN@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM, BHOFFMAN@CARVERDARDEN.COM, MHOFFMAN@CARVERDARDEN.COM, JURGENSEN@CARVERDARDEN.COM, JUSZCZYK@CARVERDARDEN.COM, SWIFT@CARVERDARDEN.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR