This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 17:01:07 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. HUYNH, VY

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUYNH, VY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] RITCHIE, SCOTT and RITCHIE, SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0982

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] RITCHIE, SCOTT

RITCHIE, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

HUYNH, VY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET

2/16/2023: COVERSHEET

COMPLAINT

2/16/2023: COMPLAINT

PROPOSED SUMMONS

2/16/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/16/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023013152

2/23/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023013152

SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

2/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingDate time: 4/14/2023 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: RITCHIE, SCOTT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/23/2023; Receipt Number: 2023013152; Applied Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 04/14/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: RITCHIE, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023013152

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketRITCHIE, SCOTT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/17/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000982

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less