This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 19:01:32 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. HOPSON, DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOPSON, DAVID. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0307

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

HOPSON, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS, MARTIN S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

1/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingDate time: 3/9/2022 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: LEWIS, MARTIN S ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022004811; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 03/09/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022004811

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: FAGEN, JESSICA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 000307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS, MARTIN S