This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 17:04:58 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs. HELD, JASON

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HELD, JASON. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3508

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

HELD, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

9/25/2020: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

9/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • HearingDate time: 11/10/2020 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (11/10/2020 PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/25/2020; Receipt Number: 2020064401; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 11/10/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020064401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: FAGEN, JESSICA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003508

    Read MoreRead Less