This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/16/2020 at 23:32:50 (UTC).

PORTER, KIMBERLY ANN vs. MYRICK, JEFFREY VERNON

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 PORTER, KIMBERLY ANN filed an Other lawsuit against MYRICK, JEFFREY VERNON. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER, JOHN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0156

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PORTER, KIMBERLY ANN

Respondent

MYRICK, JEFFREY VERNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE SENT TO STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR RO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION BY AFFIDAVIT FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A VIOLATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRETURN TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SERVED 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING - Recorded (OR.8236.189 / 2020006868)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/22/2020 8:00 AM; Event: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING; Judge: MILLER, JOHN L; Location: COURTROOM 101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR CONFIDENTIAL FILING OF ADDRESS DECLINED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 01/22/2020 AT 8:00 AM IN CR 101/ , JDG: MILLER, JOHN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMILLER, JOHN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 000156

    Read MoreRead Less