This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 07/14/2022 at 15:12:24 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC vs. ROBBINS, KATHRYN E

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBBINS, KATHRYN E. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1165

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

ROBBINS, KATHRYN E

ROBBINS, KEVIN B

CITY OF PENSACOLA FLORIDA

ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA

MENDOZA, NELLY ALEXANDRA

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, COREY

Defendant Attorney

HUAL, KRISTIN D

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LISPENDENS

6/16/2022: NOTICE OF LISPENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

6/20/2022: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

NOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8808.929 / 2022063455)

6/22/2022: NOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8808.929 / 2022063455)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8808.929 / 2022063455)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022046634; Applied Amount: $978.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LISPENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/16/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001165

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CITY OF PENSACOLA FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUAL, KRISTIN D