This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 07/13/2022 at 15:04:12 (UTC).

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. KOVACS, SHELIA ANNE

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOVACS, SHELIA ANNE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] KINSEY, PAT and KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3216

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] KINSEY, PAT

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

KOVACS, SHELIA ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingDate time: 7/5/2022 1:00 PM; Event: MEDIATION; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE - THE SERVICE PACKET WAS SENT TO NORTHWEST FLORIDA PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/16/2022; Receipt Number: 2022045841; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMEDIATION SET FOR 07/05/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022045841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/15/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 003216

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant