This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/08/2021 at 19:02:16 (UTC).

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. HOODLESS, SHAWN H

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOODLESS, SHAWN H. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5064

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

HOODLESS, SHAWN H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORSILLO, STEPHEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED PAYMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingDate time: 10/29/2021 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: PRE-TRIAL HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (10/29/2021 PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/14/2021; Receipt Number: 2021070951; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 10/29/2021 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021070951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: ORSILLO, STEPHEN A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SC 005064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORSILLO STEPHEN