This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/10/2022 at 19:00:53 (UTC).

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. ARNOLD, MORGAN JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against ARNOLD, MORGAN JOSEPH. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********7095

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

ARNOLD, MORGAN JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORSILLO, STEPHEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF REPLEVIN - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF REPLEVIN TO ATTORNEY WITH CERT COPY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketORDER FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDate time: 1/12/2022 2:30 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: PRE-TRIAL HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (01/12/2022 PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(2) CERT COPIES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 12/10/2021; Receipt Number: 2021094975; Applied Amount: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 01/12/2022 AT 2:30 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2021094975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN AND FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: ORSILLO, STEPHEN A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/10/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SC 007095

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORSILLO STEPHEN