This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 18:17:28 (UTC).

PAIN CONSULTANTS OF WEST FLORIDA P A vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 PAIN CONSULTANTS OF WEST FLORIDA P A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] KINSEY, PAT and KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5327

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] KINSEY, PAT

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAIN CONSULTANTS OF WEST FLORIDA P A

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINER, MELISSA R

Defendant Attorney

GREENWALD, JENNA SELSKY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingDate time: 11/18/2022 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/30/2022; Receipt Number: 2022074079; Applied Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 11/18/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022074079

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA R ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant