This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/17/2020 at 02:59:16 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs. HARRIS, J W JR

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HARRIS, J W JR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0254

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

HARRIS, J W JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

1/17/2020: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

1/17/2020: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/22/2020; Receipt Number: 2020005773; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020005773

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/22/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CC 000254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less