This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 18:46:37 (UTC).

NGUYEN, NHAN vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASULATY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 NGUYEN, NHAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASULATY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] WILLIAMS, THOMAS H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1866

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] WILLIAMS, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN, NHAN

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASULATY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN, ALEX

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketALEX@LRLC.LEGAL, SERVICE@LRLC.LEGAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/30/2022; Receipt Number: 2022074137; Applied Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022074137

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: STERN, ALEX ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketWILLIAMS, THOMAS H: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO SCHEDULE DEPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001866

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stern, Alex