This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/17/2022 at 09:11:09 (UTC).

MILLVIEW ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION vs. PHAM, TUNG T

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 MILLVIEW ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PHAM, TUNG T. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1564

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLVIEW ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

PHAM, TUNG T

MAI, TRANG T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAISER, JOHN A JR

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT, PLAINTIFF, $5,468.30

9/3/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT, PLAINTIFF, $5,468.30

COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: COMPLAINT

LISPENDENS

6/7/2021: LISPENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingDate time: 10/19/2021 11:00 AM; Event: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE - CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: DEPUTY CLERK - CIRCUIT CIVIL; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/20/2021; Receipt Number: 2021072312; Applied Amount: $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2021072312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT, PLAINTIFF, $5,468.30 - Recorded (OR.8617.509 / 2021101192)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE - CIRCUIT CIVIL SET FOR 10/19/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: DEPUTY CLERK - CIRCUIT CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketJFRAISER@MOORHEADLAW.COM, ESERVICE@MOORHEADLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: FRAISER, JOHN A JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021045311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MOORHEAD, STEPHEN R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLISPENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 001564

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRAISER, JOHN A JR