This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 02:00:41 (UTC).

MILLS, TYLER vs. EDWARDS, TINISHA

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 MILLS, TYLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDWARDS, TINISHA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCIVER (YM), KEITH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3346

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCIVER (YM), KEITH A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLS, TYLER

Respondent

EDWARDS, TINISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BELANGER, KRISTINA

WILLIAMS, JAY D III

DLUBALA, ERICA CAITLIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: WILLIAMS, JAY D III ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAMENDED EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR VIOLATING THE FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ORIGINAL ACTIONS-PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW- PETITONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION (PARENTING AND DIVORE EN V6) - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2021069803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDLUBALATEAM@KLEIGHLAW.COM, BELANGERTEAM@KLEIGHLAW.COM, WILLIAMSTEAM@KLEIGHLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: DLUBALA, ERICA CAITLIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMCIVER (YM), KEITH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 003346

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELANGER, KRISTINA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JAY D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DLUBALA, ERICA CAITLIN