This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 19:31:52 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK vs. KELLEY, GARY R

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KELLEY, GARY R. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ F-CIVIL ] BRODERSEN, AMY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1845

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ F-CIVIL ] BRODERSEN, AMY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

Defendants

KELLEY, GARY R

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

RTR PROPERTIES LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GARY R KELLEY A/K/A GARY KELLEY

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANNING, PETER E

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON, KACEE L

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

9/27/2022 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF LISPENDENS

9/27/2022 - NOTICE OF LISPENDENS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/27/2022 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8868.1599 / 2022098814)

10/3/2022: NOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8868.1599 / 2022098814)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GARY R KELLEY AKA GARY KELLEY AND UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LISPENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001845

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant