This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 19:07:07 (UTC).

MEREDITH, RYAN E vs. TWOMAYS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 MEREDITH, RYAN E filed an Other lawsuit against TWOMAYS, INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0906

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEREDITH, RYAN E

Defendants

TWOMAYS, INC.

MAY, ROY JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, CHARLES RYAN

 

Court Documents

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

5/13/2022 - CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketORDER - Recorded (OR.8825.990 / 2022073625)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketJOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STAY CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketRMORGAN@FORTHEPEOPLE.COM, JPAVLOS@FORTHEPEOPLE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 5/16/2022; Receipt Number: 2022037289; Applied Amount: $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022037289

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCOULD NOT PARSE DOCKET CODE TEXT FOR DOCKETCODE = PLATT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/13/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 000906

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less