This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/06/2022 at 19:14:21 (UTC).

MELANCON, JENA C vs. VLAHOVIC, MARCUS STEVEN

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 MELANCON, JENA C filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against VLAHOVIC, MARCUS STEVEN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ M ] BERGOSH, GARY L and BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3238

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ M ] BERGOSH, GARY L

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELANCON, JENA C

Respondent

VLAHOVIC, MARCUS STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BUSH, MEREDITH D

REMINGTON, SCOTT A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE FINAL JUDGMENT SERVED ON 9/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE - Recorded (OR.8863.528 / 2022095794)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED ON 9/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • HearingDate time: 9/14/2022 10:30 AM; Event: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: COURTROOM 101

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSREMINGTON@CLARKPARTINGTON.COM, MBUSH@CLARKPARTINGTON.COM, LDUNLAP@CLARKPARTINGTON.COM, PCOOK@CLARKPARTINGTON.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketTEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 09/14/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN CR 101/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: REMINGTON, SCOTT A ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less