This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 00:20:29 (UTC).

MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC vs. HUDSON, DONALD

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HUDSON, DONALD. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBINSON, COLEMAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2507

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC

Defendants

HUDSON, DONALD

HUDSON, HELENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINACCI, DAVID KENNETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketANSWER OF DONALD H. HUDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 8/31/2021; Receipt Number: 2021067783; Applied Amount: $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDAVID@MANAUSALAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021067783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MINACCI, DAVID KENNETH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002507

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Minacci