Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2021 at 18:21:49 (UTC).

MASON ESTATES INC vs. WHITE, JON H

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 MASON ESTATES INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WHITE, JON H. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0346

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASON ESTATES INC

Defendant

WHITE, JON H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

2/15/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/17/2021; Receipt Number: 2021011005; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021011005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketTED@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM, STEVE@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM, MARYANN@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000346

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR