This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/17/2020 at 02:32:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. KELLEY, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KELLEY, THOMAS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0307

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

KELLEY, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/21/2020: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

1/21/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/11/2020 1:30 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: PRE-TRIAL HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/22/2020; Receipt Number: 2020006112; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 03/11/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020006112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY EMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 000307

    Read MoreRead Less