This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 15:05:59 (UTC).

KOEHN, EDEN vs. LOEZA, CHRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 KOEHN, EDEN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LOEZA, CHRISTIAN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0438

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KOEHN, EDEN

Respondents

KOEHN, PHILLIP

LOEZA, CHRISTIAN

Not Yet Classified

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 2/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketHEARING OFFICER, JUVENILE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, CHILD SUPPORT AND RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPATERNITY DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET AND NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDEPARTMENT OF REVENUE REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDEPARTMENT OF REVENUE REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 000438

    Read MoreRead Less