This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/17/2020 at 13:59:22 (UTC).

KLOCK, MISTI LEELLEN vs. KLOCK, CHARLES WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 KLOCK, MISTI LEELLEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KLOCK, CHARLES WILLIAM. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER, JOHN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0335

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KLOCK, MISTI LEELLEN

Respondent

KLOCK, CHARLES WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GUTTMANN, ANGELA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 4/28/2020; Receipt Number: 2020030784; Applied Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN - Recorded (OR.8286.619 / 2020034050)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2020030784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION BY SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE FROM TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less