This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 06:22:26 (UTC).

JOHNSON, DON RAY vs. INNISFREE HOTELS, INC.,

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 JOHNSON, DON RAY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INNISFREE HOTELS, INC . This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0866

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, HOLLY

JOHNSON, DON RAY

Defendant

INNISFREE HOTELS, INC.,

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT INNISFREE HOTELS, INC., D/B/A HOLIDAY INN RESORT PENSACOLA BEACH, FLORIDA

6/12/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT INNISFREE HOTELS, INC., D/B/A HOLIDAY INN RESORT PENSACOLA BEACH, FLORIDA

COMPLAINT

6/9/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketREPORT OF MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRMS ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS DON RAY JOHNSON AND HOLLY JOHNSON'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/9/2017; Receipt Number: 2017060839; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017060839

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCHRIS@VLACHOSINJURYLAW.COM, REGINA@VLACHOSINJURYLAW.COM, USZ.SLTAM@ZURICHNA.COM, JEFFREY.PEARSON@ZURICHNA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: VLACHOS, CHRISTOPHER M ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/09/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000866

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INNISFREE HOTELS, INC. is a litigant