This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 18:32:42 (UTC).

JOHNSON, BERNARD vs. CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 JOHNSON, BERNARD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1374

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, BERNARD

JOHNSON, LAURA M

Defendant

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEUMAN, JOSHUA

BIBERMAN, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

NIXON, FAITH PATE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/18/2022: COMPLAINT

EMAIL DESIGNATION.

7/18/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION.

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

7/18/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

7/18/2022: PLAINTIFF'S SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

7/19/2022: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/19/2022; Receipt Number: 2022054255; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022054255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: NEUMAN, JOSHUA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSERVICE@ILGPA.COM, FAITH@ILGPA.COM, FNIXON@CARRALLSION.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BIBERMAN, MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/18/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001374

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIXON, FAITH PATE