This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 18:41:15 (UTC).

JARVIS, KELLY vs. WISSNER, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 JARVIS, KELLY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WISSNER, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1859

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JARVIS, KELLY

Defendants

WISSNER, MATTHEW

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHELL, BENJAMIN TYLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCPARSLEY@ESCLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/30/2022; Receipt Number: 2022074106; Applied Amount: $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022074106

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: SHELL, BENJAMIN TYLER ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001859

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHELL, BENJAMIN TYLER