This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 19:05:11 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER LLC vs. ARRANT, AMANDA J

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARRANT, AMANDA J. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0266

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER LLC

Defendant

ARRANT, AMANDA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/19/2022; Receipt Number: 2022004528; Applied Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2022004528

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE MAILED TO SANTRA ROSA COUNTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: LOTANE, TROY R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 000266

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF ENVELOPE MAILED TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM SANTA ROSA COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R