This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 19:12:54 (UTC).

HIRST, GEORGE vs. HARBOR VIEW MARINE LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 HIRST, GEORGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HARBOR VIEW MARINE LLC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBINSON, COLEMAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIRST, GEORGE

Defendants

HARBOR VIEW MARINE LLC

BRP US INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEASLEY, ROBERT O

Defendant Attorneys

ZOESCH, JOHN R III

KLEIN, STEVEN I

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: COMPLAINT

AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.8557.1165 / 2021068342)

6/22/2021: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.8557.1165 / 2021068342)

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/15/2021: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT HARBOR VIEW MARINE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

2/4/2021: DEFENDANT HARBOR VIEW MARINE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

BRP US, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

2/3/2021: BRP US, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO HARBOR VIEW LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO BRP US. INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT HARBOR VIEW MARINE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketBRP US, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/13/2021; Receipt Number: 2021002897; Applied Amount: $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021002897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketROBSERVICE@LAWPENSACOLA.COM, DOCKETINGMIAMI@RUMBERGER.COM, SSARASON@RUMBERGER.COM, SSARASONSECY@RUMBERGER.COM, RZ@BEGGSLANE.COM, CFV@BEGGSLANE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: PUGH, PHILLIP A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/12/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000056

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRP US INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEASLEY, ROBERT O